Title and statement of responsibility area
Title proper
General material designation
- Textual record
Parallel title
Other title information
Title statements of responsibility
Title notes
Level of description
Repository
Reference code
Edition area
Edition statement
Edition statement of responsibility
Class of material specific details area
Statement of scale (cartographic)
Statement of projection (cartographic)
Statement of coordinates (cartographic)
Statement of scale (architectural)
Issuing jurisdiction and denomination (philatelic)
Dates of creation area
Date(s)
-
1948-03-18 - 1961-03-27 (Creation)
- Creator
- LCdr. Sheppard, Donald John
Physical description area
Physical description
1 discrete item
Publisher's series area
Title proper of publisher's series
Parallel titles of publisher's series
Other title information of publisher's series
Statement of responsibility relating to publisher's series
Numbering within publisher's series
Note on publisher's series
Archival description area
Name of creator
Biographical history
Custodial history
Logbook donated by Donald John Sheppard
Scope and content
Donald John Sheppard was born on 21 January 1924 in Toronto. After graduating, he joined the RNVR Fleet Air Arm and started Pilot Course 38 at HMCS St. Vincent in May 1942. He was then selected for pilot training with the US Navy and was winged in the summer of 1943. He was posted to 1835 Squadron in October but it was disbanded in December. He was then transferred to 1836 Squadron, part of the 47 Naval Fighter Wing, and they boarded HMS Victorious in March 1944. Donald was involved in the first successful attack on the Tirpitz on 3 April. Around this time, he transferred to the RCNVR (on paper). Victorious left for the Indian Ocean in June 1944 and was involved in several attacks on Sumatran oil refineries in December 1944 and January 1945. It was here where he made his first claims and was awarded his DSC in March 1945. Victorious then headed East to join the British Pacific Fleet and operated with the US Navy during the invasion of Okinawa. Here he claimed his last victory. Donald was sent on leave to Canada when the fleet returned to Australia. He saw no further combat as the war was drawing to a close. After the war, he transferred to the RCN and was promoted to Commander in 1958. He was CO of the Escort Destroyer HMCS Fraser in the early '60s and retired in January 1974 after serving at NATO HQ.
Don Sheppard served in the Navy, and afterwards, he farmed in Nova Scotia and Ontario between 1974 and 1984. He was one of the sixteen Fleet Air Arm pilots from World War II who achieved five or more air victories, which earned him the title of an 'ace'. Sadly, he passed away on May 2, 2018.
Don Sheppard's logbook contains handwritten notes about his missions during World War II and his comrades who never made it back.
Notes area
Physical condition
Log Book is in poor condition
Immediate source of acquisition
Arrangement
Language of material
- English
Script of material
Location of originals
The original document is stored in the archive of the Shearwater Aviation Museum
Availability of other formats
Photocopy available
Restrictions on access
Open to researchers without restriction
Terms governing use, reproduction, and publication
Please note that materials cannot be borrowed and must be used within the confines of the archive's special collections room.
Finding aids
Associated materials
Accruals
No further accruals expected
Alternative identifier(s)
Standard number
Standard number
Access points
Subject access points
Place access points
Name access points
- LCdr. Sheppard, Donald John (Subject)